Reports for SL Schwettiberg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SL Schwettiberg AG
- SL Schwettiberg AG has its legal headquarters in Braunwald, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The company was founded on 27.08.2007 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 07.03.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-113.787.717.
Management (5)
newest board members
Ulrich Karl Kieser,
Christian Dürst,
Anne-Catrien Helen Pues-Lindenberg,
Balz Dürst-Zimmermann
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Daniela Huber,
Ulrich Karl Kieser,
Christian Dürst,
Anne-Catrien Helen Pues-Lindenberg,
Balz Dürst-Zimmermann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.08.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Süd
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.004.726-4
UID/VAT
CHE-113.787.717
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Detailhandelsgeschäftes insbesondere im Lebensmittelbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dionys W. Sonderegger | Küsnacht (ZH) | 07.08.2009 | 04.03.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SL Schwettiberg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005979812, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
SL Schwettiberg AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-113.787.717, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 16.10.2023, Publ. 1005861209).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dürst-Zimmermann, Erika, von Glarus Süd, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Daniela, von Hochwald, in Linthal (Glarus Süd), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005861209, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
SL Schwettiberg AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-113.787.717, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 29.06.2021, Publ. 1005231835).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Allemann-Disch, Rudolf, von Breitenbach, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kieser, Ulrich Karl, genannt Ueli, von Aarau, in Zollikon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dürst, Christian, von Glarus Süd, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005231835, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
SL Schwettiberg AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-113.787.717, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192212).
Statutenänderung:
15.06.2021.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 15.06.2021 wurden die Statuten der Gesellschaft an die Umwandlung angepasst. [bisher: Die Inhaberaktien sind am 1. Mai 2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.]
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.