Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.03.2000
Deletion from the commercial register
09.09.2024
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zizers
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.023.704-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.167.608
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die neutrale und unabhängige Beratung von natürlichen und juristischen Personen im Bereich von erneuerbaren Energien; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand von Flüe AG | Zug | <2004 | 24.05.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions SA in liquidazione
- SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions LTD in liquidation
- SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions LTD
- SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG
- SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions SA
- SIFS Select International Financial Services SA
- SIFS Select International Financial Services AG
- SIFS Select International Financial Services Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1006125132, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG in Liquidation, in Zizers, CHE-101.167.608, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2023, Publ. 1005881118). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird mit Bestätigung des zugelassenen Revisionsexperten vom 31.07.2024 vor Ablauf des Sperrjahres gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005881118, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG, in Zizers, CHE-101.167.608, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 07.05.2021, Publ. 1005173556).
Firma neu:
SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions LTD in liquidation) (SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions SA in liquidazione).
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsdomizil: c/o RRT AG Treuhand und Revision , Poststrasse 22, 7001 Chur. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.11.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zingre, Kurt, von Lauenen, in Flims, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diem, Gian Andri, von Zürich, in Ingenbohl, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Casey, Brian W., neuseeländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Auckland (NZ), Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision (CHE-107.060.038), in Chur, Liquidatorin.
Publication number: HR02-1004548926, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SEIS, Select Energy International Solutions AG, in Zizers, CHE-101.167.608, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2018, Publ. 1004468308).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diem, Gian Andri, von Zürich, in Ingenbohl, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Casey, Brian W., neuseeländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Auckland (NZ), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zingre, Kurt, von Lauenen, in Flims, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].