Reports for Schweizer Bischofskonferenz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizer Bischofskonferenz
- Schweizer Bischofskonferenz has its legal headquarters in Einsiedeln and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- On the 21.04.2022 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-392.605.566.
Management (4)
newest members of the committee
August Markus Büchel,
Dr. Felix Alphons Gerold Gmür,
Alain Guy de Raemy
newest authorized signatories
Davide Lorenzo Pesenti,
August Markus Büchel,
Dr. Felix Alphons Gerold Gmür
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.05.2021
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Einsiedeln
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.6.029.476-6
UID/VAT
CHE-392.605.566
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein SBK bezweckt die zivilrechtliche, finanzielle und administrative Verwaltung all jener Aufgaben, welche der Institution SBK durch das kanonische Recht übertragen sind, weiter die Evaluierung und Förderung pastoraler Aufgaben von gesamtschweizerischem Interesse, die interne Konsultation, die notwendige Koordination dieser Aufgaben, die gemeinsame Verabschiedung von Entscheiden sowie die Pflege der Beziehungen zu anderen Bischofskonferenzen (vgl. cc. 447-459 CIC/1983).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Progressia Société Fiduciaire et de Gestion SA | Fribourg | 19.05.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Conferenza dei vescovi svizzeri
- Conferenza dils uestgs svizzers
- Conférence des évêques suisses
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizer Bischofskonferenz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005455091, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schweizer Bischofskonferenz, in Einsiedeln, CHE-392.605.566, Verein (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 19.05.2021, Publ. 1005185842).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tanner, Dr. Erwin, von Bühler, in Laupen, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pesenti, Davide Lorenzo, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Belmont-sur-Lausanne, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1005185842, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schweizer Bischofskonferenz (Conférence des évêques suisses) (Conferenza dei vescovi svizzeri) (Conferenza dils uestgs svizzers), in Einsiedeln, CHE-392.605.566, c/o Kloster Einsiedeln, 8840 Einsiedeln, Verein (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
02.07.1969. 28.11.2018.
Zweck:
Der Verein SBK bezweckt die zivilrechtliche, finanzielle und administrative Verwaltung all jener Aufgaben, welche der Institution SBK durch das kanonische Recht übertragen sind, weiter die Evaluierung und Förderung pastoraler Aufgaben von gesamtschweizerischem Interesse, die interne Konsultation, die notwendige Koordination dieser Aufgaben, die gemeinsame Verabschiedung von Entscheiden sowie die Pflege der Beziehungen zu anderen Bischofskonferenzen (vgl. cc. 447-459 CIC/1983).
Mittel:
Mittel: Öffentliche und kirchliche Subventionen;
Spenden, Schenkungen und Vermächtnisse;
Erträge aus den Vereinstätigkeiten;
alle anderen gesetzlich erlaubten Einnahmen.
Eingetragene Personen:
Gmür, DDr. Felix, von Amden, in Solothurn, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Büchel, August Markus, genannt Markus, von Rüthi (SG), in St. Gallen, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
de Raemy, Alain, von Fribourg, in Fribourg, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tanner, Dr. Erwin, von Bühler, in Laupen, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Progressia Treuhand und Verwaltungsgesellschaft AG (CHE-107.773.730), in Fribourg, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.