Reports for Schulwandel - Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schulwandel - Stiftung
- Schulwandel - Stiftung is currently active and the industry «Operation of kindergartens and preschools». The legal headquarters are in Mollis.
- Schulwandel - Stiftung was founded on 18.11.2021.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.01.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-370.761.755.
- On the same address as Schulwandel - Stiftung there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Cändle KLG, Eduquest GmbH, Ladwig Consulting.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Nils Frederic Christian Landolt,
Caroline Isabelle Märki-von Zeerleder,
David Peter Halser,
Markus Daniel Fischer,
Nicola Bruno Malacarne
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.11.2021
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.7.006.877-2
UID/VAT
CHE-370.761.755
Sector
Operation of kindergartens and preschools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung hat den Zweck, schweizweit physische und digitale Räume für den Kompetenzerwerb aller Art zu unterstützen und so "Leuchttürme" für das Lernen der Zukunft zu fördern. Sie unterstützt Menschen dabei, ihr Potenzial zu erkennen und dieses zu entfalten. Dabei kann sie Menschen in die Selbständigkeit begleiten und sich an Projekten beteiligen, die innerhalb dieses Feldes entstehen. Zudem kann sich die Stiftung an Innovationsprozessen zur Förderung des Stiftungszweckes beteiligen. Die Stiftung ist gemeinnützig, sie verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG | Glarus Nord | 23.11.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schulwandel - Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005933935, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schulwandel - Stiftung, in Glarus Nord, CHE-370.761.755, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 04.02.2022, Publ. 1005397502).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler, Marc, von Schübelbach, in Siebnen (Galgenen), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005397502, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schulwandel - Stiftung, in Glarus Nord, CHE-370.761.755, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 23.11.2021, Publ. 1005340085).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Eidg. Departement des Innern, in Bern.
Publication number: HR01-1005340085, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schulwandel - Stiftung, in Glarus Nord, CHE-370.761.755, Erlenstrasse 19, 8753 Mollis, Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
05.11.2021.
Zweck:
Die Stiftung hat den Zweck, schweizweit physische und digitale Räume für den Kompetenzerwerb aller Art zu unterstützen und so "Leuchttürme" für das Lernen der Zukunft zu fördern. Sie unterstützt Menschen dabei, ihr Potenzial zu erkennen und dieses zu entfalten. Dabei kann sie Menschen in die Selbständigkeit begleiten und sich an Projekten beteiligen, die innerhalb dieses Feldes entstehen. Zudem kann sich die Stiftung an Innovationsprozessen zur Förderung des Stiftungszweckes beteiligen. Die Stiftung ist gemeinnützig, sie verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Eingetragene Personen:
Landolt, Nils Frederic Christian, von Glarus Nord, in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dinkel, Benjamin Nathan, von Müllheim, in Au ZH (Wädenswil), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kessler, Marc, von Schübelbach, in Siebnen (Galgenen), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Duwan, Paula Felicia, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Fischer, Markus Daniel, von Luzern, in Zug, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Halser, David Peter, von Waldkirch, in Ilanz (Ilanz/Glion), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Malacarne, Nicola Bruno, von Glarus Süd, in Glarus, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Märki-von Zeerleder, Caroline Isabelle, von Bern, in Männedorf, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schaefle, Philipp Laurens, von Schaffhausen, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
VTB Verwaltung, Treuhand und Beratung AG (CHE-101.686.179), in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.