Address
c/o F. Weiss - Treuhand
Hauptstrasse 36
5113 Holderbank AG
Reports for Schümel Naturschutzstiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schümel Naturschutzstiftung
- Schümel Naturschutzstiftung has its legal headquarters in Holderbank AG, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Schümel Naturschutzstiftung has 7 persons entered in its management.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.09.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-110.405.273.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Stefan Dietz,
Josef Roos,
Gabriele Lauper Richner,
Dr. Herfried Madritsch,
Simon Läuchli
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Stefan Dietz,
Ferdinand Weiss,
Gabriele Lauper Richner,
Simon Läuchli
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.04.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Holderbank (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.7.019.353-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.405.273
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestaltung und sachgemässen Unterhalt von Naturschutzgebieten im Aargau, primär des ehemaligen Steinbruchs "Schümel" in Holderbank.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 09.06.2005 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 08.06.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schümel Naturschutzstiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006121727, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schümel Naturschutzstiftung, in Holderbank (AG), CHE-110.405.273, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 12.07.2024, Publ. 1006083219).
Domizil neu:
c/o F. Weiss - Treuhand, Hauptstrasse 36, 5113 Holderbank AG.
Publication number: HR02-1006083219, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schümel Naturschutzstiftung, in Holderbank (AG), CHE-110.405.273, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 08.03.2021, Publ. 1005118006).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Luginbühl, Roger, von Bowil, in Holderbank (AG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Portmann, Manuel, von Obergerlafingen, in Nürensdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Studer, Jeanine, von Spreitenbach, in Holderbank (AG), Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietz, Stefan, von Ammerswil, in Ammerswil, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Läuchli, Simon, von Remigen, in Holderbank (AG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Roos, Josef, von Luzern, in Holderbank (AG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Weiss, Ferdinand, von Laufenburg, in Holderbank (AG), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005118006, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schümel Naturschutzstiftung, in Holderbank (AG), CHE-110.405.273, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 24.05.2019, Publ. 1004637989).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Büchi, Dominique, von Wildberg, in Weiningen (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Portmann, Manuel, von Obergerlafingen, in Nürensdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.