Reports for saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal
- saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal is active in the industry «Other construction» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Langenthal.
- The company was founded on 19.01.1996.
- The last commercial register change was made on 18.06.2014. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-183.660.200.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Frank Jäggi, Maler- und Gipsergeschäft, Stukkdesign, i-Bernet AG, Reifen-Schweiz Maxim Koval.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.01.1996
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Langenthal
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.9.004.291-5
UID/VAT
CHE-183.660.200
CHE-105.874.219 VAT
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gipser-, Maler-, Gerüstbaubetrieb usw
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hans Steiner AG, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal
- Steiner Hans AG, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1560521, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal, in Langenthal, CHE-183.660.200, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 16.09.2008, S. 4, Publ. 4653258).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Altbüron.
Domizil neu:
Marktgasse 42, 4900 Langenthal.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CHE-105.874.219 [bisher: Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz: CH-100.3.017.859-7].
Publication number: 4653258, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 173 vom 08.09.2008, S. 5, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 9889 vom 02.09.2008. saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal, in Langenthal, CH-053.9.004.291-5, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 08.09.2008, S. 5, Publ. 4641252).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Altbüron.
Domizil neu:
Schulhausstrasse 7, 4900 Langenthal.
Publication number: 4641252, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
saa ag, Zweigniederlassung Langenthal, in Langenthal, CH-053.9.004.291-5, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2007, S. 3, Publ. 3982318).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Altbüron.
Domizil neu:
Schulstrasse 7, 4900 Langenthal.
Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-100.3.017.859-7.
Statuten Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Statutendatums von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [gestrichen: Statuten Hauptsitz: 01.06.2007].
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Eintragungsdatums von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Zwecks von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 Abs. 1 lit. d HRegV].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung:
[Streichung von Daniel Steiner, Walter Aebischer, Hanspeter Vogelsang und Stefan Kilchenmann von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 Abs. 1 lit. e HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiner, Daniel, von Altbüron, in Langenthal, Präsident und Leiter Zweigniederlassung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aebischer, Walter, von Altbüron, in Altbüron, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogelsang, Hanspeter, von Vogelsang bei Turgi (Gemeinde Turgi), in Altbüron, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kilchenmann, Stefan, von Langnau bei Reiden, in Altbüron, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.