Reports for Roth Immobilien Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Roth Immobilien Management AG
- Roth Immobilien Management AG with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Roth Immobilien Management AG is active.
- The management of the company Roth Immobilien Management AG, which was founded on the 09.06.1976, consists of 10 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.02.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-108.028.830.
- The address is identical with 7 other active companies. These include: City-Life AG, Flora XXII GmbH, Larissa Laubscher.
Management (10)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Alexandre Fatton,
Natascha Blösch,
Ulrich Roth-Wespi,
Ines Amstutz,
Karin Roth
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.06.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.002.103-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.028.830
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Verkauf von Grundstücken, Übernahme von Treuhandmandaten, Führung von Baugesellschaften, Beteiligung an Unternehmungen und Erstellung von Schätzungen und Expertisen im Immobilien- und Bausektor.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Biel/Bienne | 25.06.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wyss + Partner Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 24.06.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Roth Management Immobilier SA
- Roth Immobilien Management
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Roth Immobilien Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005970222, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Roth Immobilien Management AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-108.028.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2023, Publ. 1005851826).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pomilio, Patrizio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005851826, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Roth Immobilien Management AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-108.028.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2023, Publ. 1005775030).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fatton, Alexandre, von Les Verrières, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005775030, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Roth Immobilien Management AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-108.028.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 24.05.2018, Publ. 4245949).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nenadic, Jasmina, von Biel/Bienne, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Tanner, Marie Françoise, von Muriaux, in Ipsach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Roth, Ulrich, von Eriz, in Studen BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Amstutz, Ines, von Eriz, in Studen BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Roth, Karin, von Eriz, in Studen BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Blösch, Natascha, von Mörigen, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Vogt, Pascale, von Basel, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Worben].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.