Reports for Rofra Baumanagement AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rofra Baumanagement AG
- Rofra Baumanagement AG with its legal headquarters in Aesch BL is active. Rofra Baumanagement AG operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Rofra Baumanagement AG consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 09.12.2010.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.01.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-116.336.802.
- Companies with the same address as Rofra Baumanagement AG: Andlau Park AG, Birspark AG, Rofra Bau AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Christian Hamann,
Stephan Hug,
Martha Franz-Guthauser,
Remo Franz-Guthauser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.014.255-4
UID/VAT
CHE-116.336.802
CHE-462.413.235 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Baumanagement-Dienstleistungen aller Art im Bereich Neubauten, Renovationen und Sanierungen. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner Hilfsunternehmen und Filialunternehmen gründen, Betriebsstätten errichten und sich an anderen kommerziellen und industriellen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann ausserdem alle Geschäfte tätigen, die den Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG | Basel | 21.12.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Basel | 15.12.2010 | 20.12.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rofra Baumanagement AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005937855, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Baumanagement AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-116.336.802, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2023, Publ. 1005917209).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Celli, Rino, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Liestal, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005917209, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Baumanagement AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-116.336.802, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2023, Publ. 1005700997).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung (CHE-105.815.004), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG (CHE-101.859.215), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005700997, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Baumanagement AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-116.336.802, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2022, Publ. 1005384564).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Franz, Fredy, von Liesberg, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamann, Christian, von Münchenstein, in Aesch (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Pfeffingen, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.