Address
c/o Simon Schmid
Raaftstrasse 12
3938 Ausserberg
Reports for Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg
- Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg with its legal headquarters in Ausserberg is active. Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg operates in the sector «Operation of an insurance company».
- The management of the organization Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg, which was founded on the 27.02.1998, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.05.2019.
- Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-100.775.998.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Bärgpauer GmbH, Wiwanni AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.02.1998
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Ausserberg
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.5.002.295-2
UID/VAT
CHE-100.775.998
Sector
Operation of an insurance company
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entschädigung der Rindviehbesitzer für sämtliche infolge Krankheit und unvorhergesehenen und unverschuldeten Unfällen erlittenen Verluste; bei der durch die Natur der Schwere der Krankheit bedingten Abschlachtung von Tieren; für die abgeschlachteten, versicherten Tiere, deren Fleisch nicht als verwendbar befunden worden ist.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rindviehversicherungskasse Ausserberg
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004623856, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, CHE-100.775.998, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 05.04.2016, S.0, Publ. 2760619).
Domizil neu:
c/o Simon Schmid, Raaftstrasse 12, 3938 Ausserberg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sterren, Erwin, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Simon, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wyssen, Barbara, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Leiggener, Barbara].
Publication number: 2760619, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, CHE-100.775.998, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 11.07.2012, Publ. 6762994).
Domizil neu:
c/o Sterren Erwin, Leiggernstrasse 40, 3938 Ausserberg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Orlando, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heynen, Manuel, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6762994, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Rindviehversicherungskasse Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, CH-600.5.002.295-2, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 12.03.1998, S. 1758).
Statutenänderung:
15.11.2011.
Firma neu:
Rindviehversicherungsgenossenschaft Ausserberg.
Domizil neu:
c/o Sterren Erwin, Eilimatta, 3938 Ausserberg. Gemäss Erklärung vom 15.11.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Die übrigen Änderungen betreffen die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen nicht.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Alex, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Treyer, Adolf, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Kassier, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sterren, Erwin, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leiggener, Barbara, von Ausserberg, in Ausserberg, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.