Reports for Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH
- Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH is active in the industry «Operation of general healthcare facilities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The management of the company Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.06.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.376.848.
- On the same address there are 11 other active companies registered. These include: ANLIKER BEWEGT AG, G & P Cruise Hotel Management GmbH, Zweigniederlassung Luzern, G&K Beteiligungen AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.11.2001
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.025.320-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.376.848
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Rehabilitations-, Physiotherapie- und Fitness-Zentrums im Zusammenhang mit den damit verbundenen Heilbehandlungen, Therapien und Sportmöglichkeiten; Erwerb und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften und Wertschriften; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wiro Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Luzern | 03.06.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005487753, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.376.848, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2020, Publ. 1005059202). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 26.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiro Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CHE-101.919.047), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005059202, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.376.848, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2020, Publ. 1004932787).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graf, Paul, von Luzern und Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Horw, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 679 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 699 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Aregger, Daniel, von Romoos, in Emmen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004932787, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Reha Zentrum Graf GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.376.848, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2009, S.13, Publ. 5156898).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aregger, Daniel, von Romoos, in Emmen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Paul Graf, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Kuslev, Srdjan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Paul Graf, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graf, Paul, von Luzern und Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Horw, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 699 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: von Luzern und Escholzmatt, mit 600 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Riedi, Christian, von Bürglen (UR), in Udligenswil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Paul Graf, mit 300 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Graf, Nicolas, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.