Reports for Régimo Genève SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Régimo Genève SA
- Régimo Genève SA in Genève is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Régimo Genève SA is active.
- The management of the company Régimo Genève SA consists of 8 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 31.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Régimo Genève SA is registered under the UID CHE-110.064.226.
- AAG atelier d'architecture Grivel & Girod SA, Batisols Sàrl, Batisols Services Sàrl are registered at the same address.
Management (8)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Alix Johner,
Jérôme Reymond,
Hervé Froidevaux,
Carole Claden,
Laurie Giroud
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.039.003-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.064.226
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exécution de tous mandats immobiliers, ainsi que toutes opérations financières, commerciales, de placement et d'assistance, principalement dans le canton de Genève, à l'exception d'opérations soumises à la LFAIE.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 22.10.2012 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | St. Gallen | 29.06.2004 | 21.10.2012 | |
Fiduciaire Lambelet Société Anonyme Fidal | Lausanne | <2004 | 28.06.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- REGIMO GENEVE SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Régimo Genève SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005807841, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Régimo Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-110.064.226 (FOSC du 30.08.2022, p. 0/1005550933). Les 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, sont désormais liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Nouveaux statuts du 16.05.2023 et modifiés le 21.07.2023. Gut Michel n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Johner Alix, de Kerzers, à Lausanne, directrice.
Publication number: HR02-1005550933, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Régimo Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-110.064.226 (FOSC du 27.01.2016, p. 0/2622643). Freymond Olivier n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Reymond Jérôme, de Gimel, à Chavornay, président et Froidevaux Hervé, des Breuleux, à Neuchâtel, sont membres du conseil d'administration, tous deux avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2622643, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Régimo Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-110.064.226 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225832). La procuration de Favre Charles est radiée. Procuration collective à deux, sauf entre elles, a été conférée à Claden Carole, d'Attalens, à Genève et Giroud Laurie, de Dompierre FR, à Siviriez.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.