Reports for Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation
- Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Grüsch and is in liquidation. It operates in the sector «Other booking services».
- Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation was founded on 02.03.2007.
- The last commercial register change was made on 04.01.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation is registered under the UID CHE-113.477.837.
Management (13)
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Georg Fromm,
Andreas Vetsch,
Jan Thomas Mosedale,
Stefan Jakob Forster-Lardon,
Ernst Flütsch
Liquidator
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Grüsch
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.4.002.057-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.477.837
Sector
Other booking services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Tourismus jeder Art in der Region Prättigau. Insbesondere ist die Gesellschaft für die gemeinsame Vermarktung regionaler Tourismusangebote zuständig. Sie kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, Zweigniederlassungen gründen und sich an andern Gesellschaften beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
michel dünser & partner ag | Schiers | 08.03.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Prättigau Tourismus GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS02-0000062967, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 04.01.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 04.01.2029 Meldungsnummer: Liquidationsschuldenruf Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation CHE-113.477.837 Aräljastrasse 10
Frist: 30 Tage Kontaktstelle:
Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation, G. Fromm, Aräljastrasse 10, 7214 Grüsch
Publication number: HR02-1005923601, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Prättigau Tourismus GmbH, in Grüsch, CHE-113.477.837, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2020, Publ. 1004908475).
Firma neu:
Prättigau Tourismus GmbH in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsdomizil: c/o Georg Fromm, Aräljastrasse 10, 7214 Grüsch. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 26.10.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sutter, Cyprian, von Jonschwil, in Davos, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flütsch, Ernst, von Luzein, in Luzein, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Forster, Stefan Jakob, von Kirchberg (SG), in Chur, Geschäftsführer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mosedale, Jan, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Seewis im Prättigau, Geschäftsführer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Vetsch, Andreas, genannt Andy, von Grabs, in Grüsch, Geschäftsführer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fromm , Georg, von Malans, in Grüsch, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, Geschäftsführer [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3945123, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Prättigau Tourismus GmbH, in Grüsch, CHE-113.477.837, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2016, Publ. 2961481).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kleinbrod, Claudia, von Quarten, in Seewis im Prättigau, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ;
Lötscher, Hanspeter, von Schiers, in Grüsch, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mosedale, Jan, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Seewis im Prättigau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vetsch, Andreas, genannt Andy, von Grabs, in Grüsch, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.