Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Head office
Other branches (13)
Reports for PORR SUISSE AG, Zweigniederlassung Aargau
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.01.2004
Deletion from the commercial register
13.07.2010
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Suhr
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.9.025.066-2
UID/VAT
CHE-339.649.791
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Bauunternehmung für Tief- und Hochbau, für Untertagebau und Umwelttechnik in der Schweiz.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PORR SUISSE AG, Zweigniederlassung Aargau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5724904, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
PORR SUISSE AG, Zweigniederlassung Aargau, in Suhr, CH-400.9.025.066-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2008, S. 2, Publ. 4565248).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Altdorf UR. Infolge Aufhebung dieser Zweigniederlassung wird der auf sie bezügliche Eintrag im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 4565248, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
PORR SUISSE AG, Zweigniederlassung Aargau, in Suhr, CH-400.9.025.066-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 20.01.2004, S. 1, Publ. 2078248).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Altdorf UR.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-120.3.000.700-3.
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichenen Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneuwly, Daniel, von Wünnewil-Flamatt und Fribourg, in Fribourg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knyrim, Gernot, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hinterbrühl (AT), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fortunati, Robert, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schattdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ziesemer, Rainer, von Schaffhausen, in Suhr, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ziswiler, Hans, von Buttisholz, in Eich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2078248, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
PORR SUISSE AG, Zweigniederlassung Aargau, in Suhr, Hübeliacker 25C, 5034 Suhr, Zweigniederlassung (Neueintragung).
Firma Hauptsitz:
PORR SUISSE AG.
Rechtsform Hauptsitz:
Aktiengesellschaft.
Hauptsitz:
Altdorf UR.
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
31.10.1975 [letzte Publikation am Hauptsitz: SHAB Nr. 186 vom 29.09.2003, S. 13].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
Betrieb einer Bauunternehmung für Tief- und Hochbau, für Untertagebau und Umwelttechnik in der Schweiz.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schneuwly, Daniel, von Wünnewil-Flamatt und Fribourg, in Fribourg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knyrim, Gernot, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hinterbrühl (AT), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fortunati, Robert, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schattdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ziesemer, Rainer, von Schaffhausen, in Suhr, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ziswiler, Hans, von Buttisholz, in Eich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.