Reports for PM Commerce Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PM Commerce Sàrl
- PM Commerce Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Lucens, is active and operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The company was founded on 08.01.2009 and has one person in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 11.08.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-114.660.580.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.01.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lucens
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.056.071-9
UID/VAT
CHE-114.660.580
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation d'une entreprise d'installations électriques, téléphoniques et informatiques, ainsi que le commerce d'appareils ménagers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- C & G Electricité Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PM Commerce Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005539537, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
C & G Electricité Sàrl, à Lucens, CHE-114.660.580 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 29.07.2022.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
PM Commerce Sàrl.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Villeneuve 8, 1522 Lucens.
Publication number: 6936004, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
C & G Electricité Sàrl, à Lucens, CH-550-1056071-9, l'exploitation d'une entreprise d'installations électriques (FOSC du 14.01.2009, p. 22/4825876). Grivaz Jean-Luc, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 30 parts de CHF 1'000 à l'associé-gérant, Chevalley Patrick, qui n'est plus président et signe désormais individuellement, désormais titulaire de 60 parts de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: 4825876, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
C & G Electricité Sàrl, à 1522 Lucens, rue Centrale, CH-550-1056071-9. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
18 décembre 2008.
But:
l'exploitation d'une entreprise d'installations électriques, téléphoniques et informatiques, ainsi que le commerce d'appareils ménagers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration des gérants du 18 décembre 2008, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Division:
la société est issue de la scission de la société CDG Electricité & Telecom S.à r.l., à Granges-près-Marnand (CH-550-0167604-6), dont la société Diserens Electricité Sàrl, à Granges-près-Marnand (CH-550-1056070-3) reprend également une partie du patrimoine. Selon projet de scission du 24 septembre 2008, la société reprend des actifs de CHF 175'190.13 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 102'655.15, soit un actif net de CHF 72'534.98, contre attribution à deux des associés de la société transférante de 60 parts de CHF 1'000.
Capital social:
CHF 60'000.
Associés-gérants avec signature collective à deux:
Chevalley Patrick, de Champtauroz, à Lucens, président, et Grivaz Jean-Luc, de Payerne, à Brenles, chacun avec 30 parts de CHF 1'000.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.