Reports for pluris immobilien ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout pluris immobilien ag
- pluris immobilien ag is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in St. Gallen. pluris immobilien ag belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management of the company pluris immobilien ag consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 14.05.2010.
- The last commercial register change was made on 16.01.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-115.681.685.
- Actria AG, AGEW AG, Aktiengesellschaft Hungerbühler & Co. Zweibruggenmühle, St. Gallen have the same address as pluris immobilien ag.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.05.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.067.173-0
UID/VAT
CHE-115.681.685
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen der Überbauung von Grundstücken, der Finanzierung von Immobiliengeschäften und dem Erwerb, der Verwaltung und dem Verkauf von Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG, Filiale St. Gallen | St. Gallen | 16.01.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revidas Revisionsgesellschaft AG | St. Gallen | 20.05.2010 | 15.01.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- AGEW Pluris AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: pluris immobilien ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005935545, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
pluris immobilien ag, in St. Gallen, CHE-115.681.685, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 27.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2171277).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revidas Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CH-320.3.024.151-6), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OBT AG, Filiale St. Gallen (CHE-406.591.524), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2171277, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
pluris immobilien ag, in St. Gallen, CHE-115.681.685, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2013, Publ. 7043946).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Landolt, Rino Franz, von Glarus Nord, in Andwil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Näfels, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Einzelprokura];
Eichmann, Jürg, von Ernetschwil, in Horn, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Ernetschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 7043946, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
AGEW Pluris AG, in St. Gallen, CH-320.3.067.173-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 11.10.2011, Publ. 6371748).
Statutenänderung:
28.01.2013.
Firma neu:
pluris immobilien ag.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.