Reports for Pletscher AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pletscher AG
- Pletscher AG in Marthalen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Foundry operation». Pletscher AG is active.
- The management of the company Pletscher AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 04.12.2001.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 30.11.2018. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Pletscher AG is registered under the UID CHE-109.408.023.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Pletscher AG, Witzig Druck AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Doris Hartwein,
Jonas Pletscher,
Johannes Pletscher-Ackermann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Marthalen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.025.249-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.408.023
Sector
Foundry operation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung und den Vertrieb von Giesserei-Produkten, Fahrradteilen sowie von Maschinen und Apparaten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Sie kann auch Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Budliger Treuhand AG | Zürich | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pletscher Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pletscher AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004509397, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pletscher AG, in Marthalen, CHE-109.408.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 24.04.2017, Publ. 3481265).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wirth, Paul André, von Ursenbach, in Muri AG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hartwein, Doris, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Klettgau (DE), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pletscher, Jonas, von Schleitheim, in Marthalen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3481265, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pletscher AG, in Marthalen, CHE-109.408.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 12.01.2017, Publ. 3278107).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Götschi-Pletscher, Silvia, von Galmiz, in Marthalen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pletscher-Ackermann, Johannes, von Schleitheim, in Marthalen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3278107, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pletscher AG, in Marthalen, CHE-109.408.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2013, Publ. 1124961).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pletscher-Ackermann, Johannes, von Schleitheim, in Marthalen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Budliger Treuhand AG (CHE-103.622.262), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Budliger Treuhand AG (CH-020.3.904.536-7)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.