Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o HYGA AG
Fabrikstrasse 1
2543 Lengnau BE
Reports for Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie. in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.1967
Deletion from the commercial register
04.08.2016
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Lengnau (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.7.004.042-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.771.759
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge der Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma durch Gewährung von Unterstützungen oder Beiträgen an Arbeitnehmer, Ehegatten und Kinder von Arbeitnehmern im Falle von Alter, Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität oder Tod.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wyss + Partner Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 25.05.2012 | 03.08.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie.
- Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie. in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2987749, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie. in Liquidation, in Lengnau (BE), CHE-109.771.759, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 19.08.2013, Publ. 1032511). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Stiftung wird gemäss rechtskräftiger Verfügung der Bernischen BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BBSA) vom 17.05.2016 gelöscht.
Publication number: 1032511, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie., in Lengnau BE, CH-073.7.004.042-3, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 25.05.2012, Publ. 6693070).
Name neu:
Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie. in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Bernischen BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BBSA) vom 04.07.2013 aufgehoben.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gilomen, Lisbeth, von Lengnau BE, in Lengnau BE, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gilomen, Dieter Andreas, von Lengnau BE, in Bremgarten AG, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Siegenthaler, Ruth, von Eggiwil, in Büren an der Aare, Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten].
Publication number: 6693070, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Personalvorsorgestiftung W.E. Gilomen & Cie., in Lengnau BE, CH-073.7.004.042-3, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 27.03.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6612256).
Domizil neu:
c/o HYGA AG, Fabrikstrasse 1, 2543 Lengnau bei Biel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gilomen, Walter Erwin, von Lengnau BE, in Lengnau BE, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Imboden, Josef, in St. Niklaus, in Lengnau BE, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gilomen, Dieter Andreas, von Lengnau BE, in Bremgarten AG, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Siegenthaler, Ruth, von Eggiwil, in Büren an der Aare, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Wyss + Partner Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.003.576-5), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.