Address
c/o Hinderer Holding AG
Schlössli
8618 Oetwil am See
Reports for Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation with its legal headquarters in Oetwil am See is in liquidation. Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- The management consists of 9 persons. The organization was founded on 21.09.1957.
- The last commercial register change was made on 03.08.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.723.358.
- On the same address there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: Clienia Schlössli AG, Hinderer Holding AG, Stiftung der Familie Hinderer.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Stephanie Gunzelmann,
Christina Zürcher,
Claudia Mend,
Daniel Franz Wild,
Adrian Ernst Ill
newest authorized signatories
Adrian Ernst Ill,
David Johannes Bosshard,
Thomas Edward Haab,
Claudia Magdalena Tantanini
Liquidator
Stephanie Gunzelmann,
Christina Zürcher,
Claudia Mend,
Daniel Franz Wild,
Adrian Ernst Ill
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.09.1957
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Oetwil am See
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.901.832-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.723.358
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die berufliche Vorsorge im Rahmen des BVG und seiner Ausführungsbestimmungen für die Arbeitnehmer der unter der Hinderer Holding AG zusammengeschlossenen Firmen Clienia Schlössli AG, Bergheim Uetikon AG, Hinderer Liegenschaften AG und mit diesen wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundener Unternehmungen, sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassene gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Invalidität und Tod. Der Anschluss einer verbundenen Unternehmung erfolgt aufgrund einer schriftlichen Anschlussvereinbarung, die der Aufsichtsbehörde zur Kenntnis zu bringen ist. Die Stiftung kann über die gesetzlichen Mindestleistungen hinaus weitergehende Vorsorge betreiben, einschliesslich Unterstützungsleistungen in Notlagen, wie bei Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität oder Arbeitslosigkeit. Zur Erreichung ihres Zweckes kann die Stiftung Versicherungsverträge abschliessen oder in bestehende Verträge eintreten, wobei sie selbst Versicherungsnehmerin und Begünstigte sein muss.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 08.07.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005808942, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation, in Oetwil am See, CHE-109.723.358, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005687718).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ritter-Vogt, Käthi, von Dietikon, in Volketswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidatorin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gunzelmann, Stephanie, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Dürnten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidatorin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: LS05-0000002995, Commercial Registry Office Aargau
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Stiftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 03.03.2023, Mehrfache Veröffentlichung: 01.03.2023, 02.03.2023 Voraussichtliches Ablaufdatum: 01.03.2028 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Toptima AG, Bahnhofstrasse 4, 5000 Aarau Im Auftrag von: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation c/o Hinderer Holding AG Schlössli
Kontaktstelle: Toptima AG, Bahnhofstrasse 4,
Publication number: LS05-0000002994, Commercial Registry Office Aargau
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Stiftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 02.03.2023, Mehrfache Veröffentlichung: 01.03.2023, 03.03.2023 Voraussichtliches Ablaufdatum: 01.03.2028 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Toptima AG, Bahnhofstrasse 4, 5000 Aarau Im Auftrag von: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hinderer Gruppe in Liquidation c/o Hinderer Holding AG Schlössli
Kontaktstelle: Toptima AG, Bahnhofstrasse 4,
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.