Reports for Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation
- Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation with its legal headquarters in Noës is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods». Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation is in liquidation.
- The management of the company Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 19.09.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.914.284.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sierre
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.001.181-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.914.284
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation générale d'une menuiserie dans le sens le plus large du terme et exploitation de toutes autres branches concernant le commerce du bois. Elle peut également entreprendre toute opération immobilière liée à son activité
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | 08.03.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Transalp, Donald Moos | Sion | 19.01.2011 | 07.03.2023 | |
Fiva SA | Sion | <2004 | 18.01.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA
- Jean-Luc Perruchoud SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006133781, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA, à Sierre, CHE-107.914.284, société anonyme (No. FOSC 47 du 08.03.2023, Publ. 1005696096).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Perruchoud Jean-Luc SA en liquidation.
Autres adresses:
Chemin des Abeilles 10, 3976 Noës (adresse de liquidation). La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 23.07.2024.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Perren, Christophe, de Mollens VS, à Sierre, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Perruchoud, Jean-Luc, de Chalais, à Chalais, administrateur, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.