Reports for Papierhaus Malters GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Papierhaus Malters GmbH
- Papierhaus Malters GmbH in Malters is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Papierhaus Malters GmbH is active.
- Papierhaus Malters GmbH was founded on 07.02.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.11.2022.
- The company's UID is CHE-372.988.488.
Management (2)
Executive board
Marie Charlotte Geisseler Holm,
Christa Maria Furrer Bischof
newest authorized signatories
Marie Charlotte Geisseler Holm,
Christa Maria Furrer Bischof
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Malters
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.803.312-9
UID/VAT
CHE-372.988.488
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Restaurationsbetriebes, Take Away, Catering und Handel mit Lebensmitteln, Geschenkartikeln und Waren aller Art; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Halten, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken sowie Urheberrechten, Patenten und Lizenzen aller Art.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Papierhaus Malters GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005605433, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Papierhaus Malters GmbH, in Malters, CHE-372.988.488, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 10.02.2017, Publ. 3339767).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Birri-Bühlmann, Maria Frieda, von Zeihen, in Malters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geisseler Holm, Marie Charlotte, genannt Charlotte, von Triengen und Malters, in Malters, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 7'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00].
Publication number: 3339767, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Papierhaus Malters GmbH, in Malters, CHE-372.988.488, Schwarzenbergstrasse 8, 6102 Malters, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
03.02.2017.
Zweck:
Betrieb eines Restaurationsbetriebes, Take Away, Catering und Handel mit Lebensmitteln, Geschenkartikeln und Waren aller Art;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Halten, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken sowie Urheberrechten, Patenten und Lizenzen aller Art.
Stammkapital:
CHF 21'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung der Gründerinnen vom 03.02.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Birri-Bühlmann, Maria Frieda, von Zeihen, in Malters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00;
Furrer Bischof, Christa Maria, von Entlebuch, Malters und Eggersriet, in Malters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00;
Geisseler Holm, Marie Charlotte, genannt Charlotte, von Malters und Triengen, in Malters, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.