Reports for Packwerk AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Packwerk AG
- Packwerk AG has its legal headquarters in Hausen am Albis and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management of the company Packwerk AG, which was founded on the 13.02.2012, consists of 4 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 27.08.2021.
- In the commercial register the company Packwerk AG is registered under the UID CHE-269.513.078.
- On the same address there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: barbara liebt blumen Barbara Rhyner, Diamant Kaffee und Tee GmbH, Dimac Handelsagentur, Inhaberin Hana Gucher.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Franziska Schmellentin,
Cyrill Madörin,
Philipp Roland Frommenwiler,
Christian Wey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.02.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hausen am Albis
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.036.593-3
UID/VAT
CHE-269.513.078
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Handelsunternehmens für den Vertrieb diverser Produkte, insbesondere Etiketten, Thermotransferbänder, Drucker, Verpackungen sowie Erbringung aller damit zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SPIEGEL TREUHAND AG | Kappel (SO) | 27.08.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Confida Treuhand GmbH | Fischbach-Göslikon | 02.11.2018 | 26.08.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Packwerk Ltd
- Packwerk SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Packwerk AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005278807, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Packwerk AG, in Hausen am Albis, CHE-269.513.078, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 18.05.2020, Publ. 1004891232).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Confida Treuhand GmbH (CHE-109.086.190), in Fischbach-Göslikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
SPIEGEL TREUHAND AG (CHE-113.168.885), in Kappel (SO), Revisionsstelle;
Schmellentin, Franziska, von Thusis, in Fischbach-Göslikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004891592, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Packwerk AG, in Baar, CHE-269.513.078, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2018, Publ. 1004489533). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Hausen am Albis im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zug von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004891232, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Packwerk AG, bisher in Baar, CHE-269.513.078, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2018, Publ. 1004489533).
Statutenänderung:
06.05.2020.
Sitz neu:
Hausen am Albis.
Domizil neu:
Weisbrod-Areal 4, 8915 Hausen am Albis.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wey, Christian, von Merenschwand, in Muri (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Buttwil];
Frommenwiler, Philipp, von Rorschacherberg, in Maur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Madörin, Cyrill, von Zürich, in Horgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.