Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Omnis Mundi AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.03.2007
Deletion from the commercial register
30.07.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.060.914-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.495.396
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Direkte und indirekte Beteiligung an Unternehmen zwecks deren Förderung, Unterstützung und Finanzierung sowie Veräusserung solcher Beteiligungen, Beratung von Unternehmen und von Privaten sowie Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art, insbesondere in den Bereichen Private Equity und Venture Capital. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Tochtergesellschaften gründen, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Immobilien und Lizenzen erwerben, halten, verwalten, belasten oder veräussern, sowie in irgendeiner Form Patente, Marken, Designrechte, Urheberrechte sowie andere gewerbliche Schutzrechte erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisal AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | 16.04.2008 | 29.07.2018 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 27.07.2007 | 15.04.2008 | |
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 15.03.2007 | 26.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omnis Mundi AG
- Omnis Mundi Invest AG
- Mountain Real Estate Opportunities AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Omnis Mundi AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4388525, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Omnis Mundi AG in Liquidation, in St. Gallen, CHE-113.495.396, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2017, Publ. 3780907). Nachdem die Zustimmungen der Eidgenössischen Steuerverwaltung und des Kantonalen Steueramtes vorliegen, wird die Gesellschaft im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 3780907, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Omnis Mundi AG in Liquidation, in St. Gallen, CHE-113.495.396, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 06.02.2014, Publ. 1331069). Liquidation beendet. Die Gesellschaft kann mangels Zustimmungen der Eidgenössischen Steuerverwaltung und des Kantonalen Steueramtes noch nicht gelöscht werden.
Publication number: 1331069, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Omnis Mundi AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-113.495.396, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 210 vom 28.10.2011, Publ. 6395004).
Firma neu:
Omnis Mundi AG in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
Poststrasse 17, 9001 St. Gallen. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 27.01.2014 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Drexler, Ingo, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kilchberg ZH, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Falys, Alain, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Heydenreich, Gerald, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Frankfurt am Main (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].