About Octavio Fund
- The management of the company Octavio Fund consists of 0 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.03.2018.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for Octavio Fund
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 20235364, (1)
Handelsregister 17.03.2018, Octavio Fund, Vaduz (FL-0002.468.573-0) Kollektivtreuhänderschaft (Unit Trust) Der Fonds befindet sich gemäss Beschluss der Verwaltungsgesellschaft vom 14.03.2018.
Publication number: 20192885, (1)
Handelsregister 19/03/2015, Octavio Fund, Vaduz (FL-0002.468.573-0) Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: IFOS Internationale Fonds Service Aktiengesellschaft, 9490 Vaduz, Verwaltungsgesellschaft.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
CAIAC Fund Management AG, 9487 Gamprin-Bendern, Verwaltungsgesellschaft.
Publication number: 20185451, (1)
Handelsregister 02/10/2014, Octavio Fund, Vaduz (FL-0002.468.573-0) Kollektivtreuhänderschaft (Unit Trust) Bezeichnung neu: Octavio Fund.