Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for OARIS AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.1994
Deletion from the commercial register
29.05.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.000.594-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.251.861
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen aller Art im Bereich der Betriebsorganisation sowie die Herstellung und den Vertrieb von Waren aller Art in den Bereichen EDV-Hard- und Software. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, und gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immobilien erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben und Geschäfte eingehen, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fecker Treuhand & Revision GmbH | Felben-Wellhausen | 02.07.2012 | 28.05.2018 | |
Bruni Treuhand GmbH | Sarnen | 23.05.2005 | 01.07.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Oaris Consulting GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OARIS AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4254171, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
OARIS AG, in Urdorf, CHE-102.251.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 23.05.2017, Publ. 3537789). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die MACD AG, in Maur (CHE- 113.711.571), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3537789, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 96 vom 18.05.2017 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 17'087 vom 15.05.2017 OARIS AG, in Urdorf, CHE-102.251.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 18.05.2017, Publ. 3529411).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Macdonald, George, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: Mcdonald, George, britischer Staatsangehöriger].
Publication number: 3529411, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
OARIS AG, in Urdorf, CHE-102.251.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2012, Publ. 6745890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reist, Andreas, von Oberburg, in Stallikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mcdonald, George, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meister, Kurt, von Matzendorf, in Unterlunkhofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Oberwil-Lieli, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Fecker Treuhand & Revision GmbH (CHE-248.329.741), in Felben-Wellhausen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Fecker Treuhand & Revision GmbH (CH-440.4.025.239-7)].