Reports for NIDSWISS SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NIDSWISS SA
- NIDSWISS SA has its legal headquarters in Beckenried and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other freelance work».
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 06.02.2023.
- In the commercial register the company NIDSWISS SA is registered under the UID CHE-103.114.066.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.1977
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Beckenried
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.002.593-7
UID/VAT
CHE-103.114.066
Sector
Other freelance work
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Planung, Finanzierung sowie die nachhaltige Umsetzung von Projekten aller Art. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an Gesellschaften beteiligen, Wertschriften und Lizenzen erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann mit ihren Geschäftspartnern oder Dritten abgesicherte Finanzgeschäfte aller Art eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Geschäftszwecks zu fördern oder zu erleichtern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
René Brunner Treuhand AG | Zürich | 14.09.2012 | 13.11.2013 | |
KMU Treuhand & Management, Irma Rupp | Kriens | 30.03.2007 | 13.09.2012 | |
Latin-Consult SA | Mesocco | <2004 | 29.03.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- NIDSWISS AG
- NIDSWISS LTD
- GERALKA PROJECT AG
- GERALKA PROJECT SA
- GERALKA PROJECT LTD
- GERALKA LTD
- GERALKA SA
- GERALKA AG
- Geralka SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NIDSWISS SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005670506, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
NIDSWISS SA, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-103.114.066, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 10.03.2022, Publ. 1005423924).
Statutenänderung:
31.01.2023.
Sitz neu:
Beckenried.
Domizil neu:
Rütenenstrasse 102, 6375 Beckenried.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Publication number: HR02-1005423924, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
NIDSWISS SA, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-103.114.066, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 13.04.2021, Publ. 1005147646).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willimann, Urs Erich, von Beromünster, in Egg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Matti, Martina, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Beckenried, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005147646, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
NIDSWISS SA, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-103.114.066, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2020, Publ. 1005046389).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Matti, Martina, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Beckenried, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.