Reports for Mont Trading SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mont Trading SA
- Mont Trading SA has its legal headquarters in Veyrier and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company Mont Trading SA consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 16.10.2007.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 13.11.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Mont Trading SA is the following: CHE-113.868.563.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.10.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Veyrier
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.2.500.007-9
UID/VAT
CHE-113.868.563
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce, exportation, importation et distribution de biens de consommation et industriels principalement dans les domaines du revêtement de sol, de l'alimentation, de l'habillement et de l'industrie du jouet; prise de participations dans toutes entreprises financières, commerciales ou industrielles, sous quelque forme que ce soit, ainsi qu'acquisition d'immeubles, à l'exception des opérations soumises à la LFAIE.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TOSCO FIDUCIAIRE | Veyrier | 27.06.2011 | 30.09.2014 | |
Véronique Charuel | Genève | 27.07.2010 | 26.06.2011 | |
Fiduciaire Aeschlimann | Genève | 22.10.2007 | 26.07.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mont Trading SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005883723, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mont Trading SA, à Veyrier, CHE-113.868.563 (FOSC du 21.02.2022, p. 0/1005410923). Les pouvoirs de Davidenko Inna sont radiés.
Administration:
Iseli Marc Alain, nommé président, et Davidenko Valeriya, de Ollon, à Genève, lesquels signent individuellement.
Publication number: HR02-1005410923, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mont Trading SA, à Veyrier, CHE-113.868.563 (FOSC du 16.07.2021, p. 0/1005251700). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives;
par décision de l'assemblée générale du 14.02.2022, les statuts de la société ont été adaptés à la conversion. Les actions sont liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée ou courriel. Nouveaux statuts du 14.02.2022.
Publication number: HR02-1005251700, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mont Trading SA, à Veyrier, CHE-113.868.563 (FOSC du 06.10.2020, p. 0/1004994091). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.