Branches (1)
Reports for module sa architectures
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout module sa architectures
- module sa architectures has its legal headquarters in Romont FR, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company module sa architectures consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 26.02.1981.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 02.07.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-105.878.111.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.1981
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Romont (FR)
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.133.773-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.878.111
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation d'un bureau d'architecte et d'un atelier de recherches et d'applications architecturales; tous conseils études et plans de réalisation en matière de construction rurales. La société peut effectuer toutes opérations commerciales, financières, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Felder Maurice | Cottens (FR) | 15.08.1996 | 07.05.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Module S.A.
- Module SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: module sa architectures
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005237156, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
module sa architectures, à Romont (FR), CHE-105.878.111 (FOSC du 08.05.2019, p. 0/1004625355).
Personne radiée:
Monney Bernard Jean Michel, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004625355, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Module S.A., à Romont (FR), CHE-105.878.111 (FOSC du 03.09.2018, p. 0/4447474).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
module sa architectures.
Nouveau but:
l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architecte et d'un atelier de recherches et d'applications architecturales;
tous conseils études et plans de réalisation en matière de construction rurales. La société peut effectuer toutes opérations commerciales, financières, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but. La clause statutaire d'apport en nature du 12.02.1981 est abrogée. L'inscription concernant la communication aux actionnaires est radiée. Statuts modifiés le 02.05.2019.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Collini Marco, administrateur, président, signature individuelle, maintenant à Romont FR;
Kohler David, administrateur, signature individuelle, maintenant à La Folliaz. Maurice Felder S.A. (CH-217-0138013-3) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 02.05.2019, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Publication number: HR02-0004447474, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Module S.A., à Romont (FR), CHE-105.878.111 (FOSC du 15.09.2017, p. 0/3754533).
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Collini Marco, administrateur, signature individuelle, maintenant à Torny, administrateur président, signature individuelle;
Monney Bernard, adminisrateur président, signature individuelle, nom précis Monney Bernard Jean Michel, maintenant de Ursy, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Kohler David, de Rüeggisberg, à Romont FR, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.