Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Froidevaux, Eicher & Partner GmbH
Birkenweg 7
8700 Küsnacht ZH
Reports for MMR Medical Market Research GmbH in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.02.2009
Deletion from the commercial register
30.03.2012
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Küsnacht (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.039.544-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.725.529
Sector
Market and opinion research services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Marktforschungsleistungen aller Art insbesondere auf dem Gebiet der Medizin, der Pharmazeutik, der Medizintechnik, der Chemie, der Kosmetik, des Gesundheitswesens und auch auf dem Gebiet anderer Branchen- und Industriezweige. Zudem kann die Gesellschaft auch Beratungsdienstleistungen zuhanden von Dritten erbringen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cathomen + Partner Treuhandgesellschaft | Steffisburg | 20.02.2009 | 06.06.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- MMR Medical Market Research GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MMR Medical Market Research GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6617828, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MMR Medical Market Research GmbH in Liquidation, in Küsnacht ZH, CH-020.4.039.544-8, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 07.06.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6194336). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 6194336, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MMR Medical Market Research GmbH in Liquidation, in Küsnacht ZH, CH-020.4.039.544-8, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2011, S. 27, Publ. 5979374).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cathomen + Partner Treuhandgesellschaft (CH-092.2.015.277-6), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5979374, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MMR Medical Market Research GmbH, in Küsnacht ZH, CH-020.4.039.544-8, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2009, S. 25, Publ. 4890206).
Firma neu:
MMR Medical Market Research GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 22.12.2010 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eicher, Frank, von Riggisberg, in Dübendorf, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 80 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Froidevaux, Dominique, von Le Noirmont, in Zumikon, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 80 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zambaz, Blaise, von Conthey, in Horgen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dula, Daniel, von Buttisholz, in Cham, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.