Address
c/o Marin Wenger
Hegifeldstrasse 26a
8404 Winterthur
Reports for Mirame-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mirame-Stiftung
- Mirame-Stiftung is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Winterthur. Mirame-Stiftung belongs to the industry «Other social services» and is currently active.
- Mirame-Stiftung has 5 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.12.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-109.748.111.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Andrea Vuillème,
Marin Wenger,
Claudia Comelli,
Heinz Wirthlin
newest authorized signatories
Andrea Vuillème,
Marin Wenger,
Claudia Comelli,
Heinz Wirthlin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.07.1997
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.507-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.748.111
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Finanzielle Unterstützung von bedürftigen Kindern und älteren Personen in Entwicklungsländern bei der Verbesserung ihrer allgemeinen, finanziellen und gesundheitlichen Lebenssituation; Projektierung und Finanzierung von Unterstützungsaktionen (insbesondere Aufbau und Unterhalt von Schulen und anderen Unterrichtsinstitutionen, finanzielle Hilfe bei medizinischer Versorgung und Prävention sowie Aufbau und Unterstützung bei Kultur- und Wirtschaftsprojekten) für Kinder und ältere Personen in Entwicklungsländern; kann sich auch an bestehenden Hilfsprojekten anderer Organisationen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Winco Treuhand AG | Winterthur | 18.12.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Coordinator Control AG | Winterthur | 14.12.2009 | 17.12.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mirame-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004786150, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mirame-Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-109.748.111, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2019, Publ. 1004576682).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Coordinator Control AG (CHE-102.081.518), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Winco Treuhand AG (CHE-354.886.915), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004576682, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mirame-Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-109.748.111, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2014, S.0, Publ. 1369909).
Domizil neu:
c/o Marin Wenger, Hegifeldstrasse 26a, 8404 Winterthur.
Publication number: 1369909, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mirame-Stiftung, in Illnau-Effretikon, CHE-109.748.111, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 14.12.2009, S. 21, Publ. 5390806).
Urkundenänderung:
10.01.2014.
Sitz neu:
Winterthur. [Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 HRegV.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wenger, Marin, von Bottighofen, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Illnau-Effretikon];
Vuillème, Andrea, von Campo (Vallemaggia), in Gossau ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Coordinator Control AG (CHE-102.081.518), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Coordinator Control AG (CH-020.4.000.338-1), in Illnau-Effretikon].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.