Address
c/o Compagnie Financière Michelin Suisse SA
Chamblioux-Parc 12
1763 Granges-Paccot
Reports for Michelin Invest SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Michelin Invest SA
- Michelin Invest SA with its legal headquarters in Granges-Paccot is active. Michelin Invest SA operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The company was founded on 18.05.1988.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 10.07.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-101.462.705.
- There are 7 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Compagnie Financière Michelin Suisse SA, MC Projects B.V. Maastricht, succursale de Granges-Paccot, Michelin Finanz Gesellschaft fuer Beteiligungen AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Sonia Sciboz,
Claudio-Christoph Buchs,
Annelise Marie Somson
newest authorized signatories
Sonia Sciboz,
Claudio-Christoph Buchs,
Annelise Marie Somson
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Granges-Paccot
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.136.155-9
UID/VAT
CHE-101.462.705
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Prise de participations et gestion d'investissement à courts et à longs termes dans toutes sociétés et entreprises et généralement effectuer toutes opérations financières et commerciales en rapport direct ou indirect avec ce but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 31.08.2007 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | <2004 | 30.08.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Michelin Invest Ltd
- Michelin Invest AG
- Michelin Invest S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Michelin Invest SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006080686, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Michelin Invest SA, à Granges-Paccot, CHE-101.462.705 (FOSC du 06.12.2023, p. 0/1005902515).
Personne radiée:
Dona Anna Lisa, administratrice, présidente, signature individuelle.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Somson Annelise Marie, administratrice, signature individuelle, maintenant administratrice, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Sciboz Sonia, de St. Ursen, à La Sonnaz, administratrice, présidente, signature collective à deu;
Buchs Claudio-Christoph, de Jaun, à Avry, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005902515, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Michelin Invest SA, à Granges-Paccot, CHE-101.462.705 (FOSC du 18.05.2022, p. 0/1005476614).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chamblioux-Parc 12, c/o Compagnie Financière Michelin Suisse SA, 1763 Granges-Paccot.
Publication number: HR02-1005476614, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Michelin Invest SA, à Granges-Paccot, CHE-101.462.705 (FOSC du 27.05.2021, p. 0/1005194125).
Personne radiée:
Eggertswyler Florence, administratrice, présidente, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Dona Anna Lisa, d'Italie, à Bern, administratrice, présidente, signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.