Reports for MessX AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MessX AG
- MessX AG has its legal headquarters in Rorschach and is active. It operates in the sector «Technical, physical and chemical testing».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 27.06.2014.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.11.2017. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company MessX AG is registered under the UID CHE-339.569.844.
- Bauunterstützung, Schwarz und Partner, GmbH, DST13 GmbH, ElleEsse Boxing GmbH have the same address as MessX AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rorschach
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.075.961-0
UID/VAT
CHE-339.569.844
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Qualitätssicherung (industrielle Messtechnik) mit Schwerpunkt in der computertomografischen Analyse. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, bewirtschaften verwerten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Urs Gmünder AG | St. Gallen | 29.09.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treviso Revisions AG | St. Gallen | 02.07.2014 | 28.09.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MessX AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3846733, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MessX AG, in Rorschach, CHE-339.569.844, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 29.09.2015, Publ. 2397763).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Horber, Stefan, von Aadorf, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kahl, Lars, von Eggiwil, in Lutzenberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wyss, Daniel, von Küsnacht ZH, in Walzenhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2397763, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MessX AG, in Rorschach, CHE-339.569.844, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 22.09.2014, Publ. 1726315).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treviso Revisions AG (CHE-105.491.025), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kahl, Lars, von Eggiwil, in Lutzenberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wyss, Daniel, von Küsnacht ZH, in Walzenhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Urs Gmünder AG (CHE-281.063.985), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1726315, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MessX AG, in Rorschach, CHE-339.569.844, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1587095).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Horber, Stefan, von Aadorf, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.