Reports for Medical Leasing Lorze AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Medical Leasing Lorze AG
- Medical Leasing Lorze AG has its legal headquarters in Hagendorn and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- Medical Leasing Lorze AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 19.02.2015, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-112.836.081.
- Next to the company Medical Leasing Lorze AG there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Kiebitz Immo AG, Rosetta Holding AG, Streamgate Trading AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Dr. med. Anton Huwyler,
Michael Christian Huwyler,
Yanik Vitalis Urs Huwyler
newest authorized signatories
Dr. med. Anton Huwyler,
Michael Christian Huwyler,
Yanik Vitalis Urs Huwyler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.03.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.029.293-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.836.081
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Medizinische und nichtmedizinische Gerätschaften aller Art sowie Immobilien als Leasingobjekte Aerzten, Zahnärzten, Laborinstituten und anderen natürlichen und juristischen Personen zum Gebrauch zu überlassen (Leasing) oder diese Güter zu verkaufen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen ähnlicher Art beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten, Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten, verwalten und vermieten sowie Patente, Lizenzen und andere immaterielle Güter erwerben, zum Gebrauch überlassen (Leasing) oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
JWK Treuhand AG in Liquidation | Dottikon | 28.03.2006 | 07.07.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Medical Leasing Lorze AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1999159, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Medical Leasing Lorze AG, in Cham, CHE-112.836.081, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 08.07.2014, Publ. 1600911).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huwyler, Michael, von Mühlau, in Dietlikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Baden].
Publication number: 1600911, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Medical Leasing Lorze AG, in Cham, CHE-112.836.081, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2011, Publ. 6349116).
Statutenänderung:
20.06.2014.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen]. Mit Erklärung vom 20.06.2014 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
JWK Treuhand AG, in Wohlen AG, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6349116, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Medical Leasing Lorze AG, in Cham, CH-170.3.029.293-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2006, S. 15, Publ. 3306988).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huwyler, Dr. Anton, von Mühlau, in Hagendorn, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Huwyler, Michael, von Mühlau, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huwyler, Yanik, von Mühlau, in Wohlen AG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.