Reports for Max Gianini AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Max Gianini AG
- Max Gianini AG in Uzwil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Max Gianini AG is active.
- Max Gianini AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 04.04.2017. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Max Gianini AG is the following: CHE-101.925.349.
Management (3)
newest board members
Adele Gianini,
Maria Kliebens-Dirnberger,
Gabriella Gianini-Chioini
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.1940
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uzwil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.011.362-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.925.349
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verwaltung von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen..
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zellweger Treuhand- und Verwaltungs AG | Herisau | 06.09.2005 | 21.07.2009 | |
Revisions- und Treuhandbüro Hansjörg Fisch, Treuhandexperte STV | St. Gallen | <2004 | 05.09.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Max Gianini AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3444013, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Max Gianini AG, in Uzwil, CHE-101.925.349, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 22.07.2009, S. 19, Publ. 5152964).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kliebens, Emil, von Hauptwil, in Uzwil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gianini, Adele, von Paradiso, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Uzwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kliebens-Dirnberger, Maria, von Hauptwil-Gottshaus, in Uzwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Gianini-Chioini, Gabriella, von Paradiso, in Castagneto Carducci (IT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Livorno (I)].
Publication number: 5152964, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Max Gianini AG, in Uzwil, CH-320.3.011.362-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 06.09.2005, S. 12, Publ. 3006034).
Statutenänderung:
25.06.2009.
Zweck neu:
Verwaltung von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen..
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre haben in schriftlicher Form an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen zu erfolgen. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 25.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zellweger Treuhand- und Verwaltungs AG, in Herisau, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3006034, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Max Gianini AG, in Uzwil, CH-320.3.011.362-0, Verwaltung, Erwerb, Überbauung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften usw. Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 09.12.1997, S. 8870).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revisions- und Treuhandbüro Hansjörg Fisch, Treuhandexperte STV, in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zellweger Treuhand- und Verwaltungs AG, in Herisau, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.