Reports for Marti Management Services AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Marti Management Services AG
- Marti Management Services AG in Kallnach is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Marti Management Services AG is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.01.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.933.488.
- BVG-Stiftung Ernst Marti AG, Ernst Marti AG, Personalvorsorgestiftung Ernst Marti AG have the same address as Marti Management Services AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Michel Limberis,
Anita Lüthi,
Silvia Birkhofer,
Heinrich Ernst Marti
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.05.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kallnach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.111.663-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.933.488
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, den Verkauf, den Bau, das Halten, die Vermietung und die Vermittlung von Liegenschaften und Betriebsstätten sowie das Betreiben von Handel mit Betriebsstoffen aller Art. Ferner erbringt die Gesellschaft Dienstleistungen der Beherbergung und der Beratung im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG Bern | Bern | 08.09.2008 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | <2004 | 07.09.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BusConcept AG
- Thomas Voyages S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Marti Management Services AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005391840, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marti Management Services AG, in Kallnach, CHE-107.933.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 06.06.2018, Publ. 4271599).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gerber, Martin, von Trubschachen, in Kallnach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marti, Heinrich Ernst, von Kallnach, in Kallnach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Limberis, Michel, von Pratteln, in Kallnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4271599, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marti Management Services AG, in Kallnach, CHE-107.933.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 26.11.2014, Publ. 1842665).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Franz Dähler AG, in Uzwil (CHE-107.648.208) gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 18.05.2018 und Bilanz per 31.12.2017. Aktiven von CHF 126'868.51 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 292'873.40 - das heisst, ein Passivenüberschuss von CHF 166'004.89 - gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Gemäss Bestätigung der zugelassenen Revisionsexpertin liegen Rangrücktritte im Umfang des Kapitalverlustes und der Überschuldung der übertragenden Gesellschaft vor. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: 1842665, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marti Management Services AG, in Kallnach, CHE-107.933.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2013, Publ. 1248685).
Statutenänderung:
17.11.2014.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, den Verkauf, den Bau, das Halten, die Vermietung und die Vermittlung von Liegenschaften und Betriebsstätten sowie das Betreiben von Handel mit Betriebsstoffen aller Art. Ferner erbringt die Gesellschaft Dienstleistungen der Beherbergung und der Beratung im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dr. Röthlisberger AG (CHE-102.704.443), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Dr. Röthlisberger AG (CH-035.3.001.220-2)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.