Reports for Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung
- Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung with its legal headquarters in St. Gallen is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung is active.
- The management of the organization Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung, which was founded on the 18.07.2023, consists of 5 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 27.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung is registered under the UID CHE-367.402.801.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Marlis Zingg,
Markus Jäger,
Martin Grob,
Raphael Joël Kobler
newest authorized signatories
Marlis Zingg,
Markus Jäger,
Martin Grob,
Raphael Joël Kobler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.07.2023
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.097.584-6
UID/VAT
CHE-367.402.801
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt gemäss dem Willen der Stifterin die finanzielle Unterstützung und Förderung des Tierwohls von Nutztieren insbesondere in der Ostschweiz. Im Sinne dieses Zweckes leistet die Stiftung Beiträge an Institutionen und und Projekte insbesondere in der Ostschweiz. Für die Verwirklichung ihres Zwecks kann die Stiftung Immobilien erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie finanzieren. Die Stiftung ist gemeinnützig tätig, hat keinen Erwerbszweck und erstrebt keinen Gewinn. Aufsichtsbehörde: noch vakant.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Treuhand und Revisions AG St.Gallen | St. Gallen | 27.11.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | St. Gallen | 21.07.2023 | 26.11.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005894505, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung, in St. Gallen, CHE-367.402.801, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2023, Publ. 1005838135).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
OBT AG (CHE-109.029.855), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Truvag Treuhand und Revisions AG St. Gallen (CHE-108.040.713), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005838135, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung, in St. Gallen, CHE-367.402.801, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2023, Publ. 1005801374).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Ostschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (CHE-113.698.580), in St. Gallen.
Publication number: HR01-1005801374, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Marlis und Gisela Zingg-Stiftung, in St. Gallen, CHE-367.402.801, Rosengartenstrasse 11, 9000 St. Gallen, Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
12.07.2023.
Zweck:
Die Stiftung bezweckt gemäss dem Willen der Stifterin die finanzielle Unterstützung und Förderung des Tierwohls von Nutztieren insbesondere in der Ostschweiz. Im Sinne dieses Zweckes leistet die Stiftung Beiträge an Institutionen und und Projekte insbesondere in der Ostschweiz. Für die Verwirklichung ihres Zwecks kann die Stiftung Immobilien erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie finanzieren. Die Stiftung ist gemeinnützig tätig, hat keinen Erwerbszweck und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Aufsichtsbehörde:
noch vakant.
Eingetragene Personen:
Zingg, Marlis, von Arbon, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grob, Martin, von Neckertal, in Herisau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jäger, Markus, von Urnäsch, in Goldach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kobler, Raphael Joel, von Rüthi (SG), in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
OBT AG (CHE-109.029.855), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.