Branches (1)
Reports for Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG
- Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG has its legal headquarters in Oberwil b. Büren and is active. It operates in the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.12.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG is the following: CHE-349.604.956.
Management (3)
newest board members
Sandro Rinaldo Imperiali,
Aldo Imperiali,
Marco Eduard Imperiali
newest authorized signatories
Sandro Rinaldo Imperiali,
Aldo Imperiali,
Marco Eduard Imperiali
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberwil bei Büren
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.054.324-0
UID/VAT
CHE-349.604.956
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Transportgeschäftes, Betrieb von Kieswerken und Betonfabrikation, Abbau von Bodenschätzen aller Art sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Sie kann sämtliche Dienstleistungen erbringen, die im Zusammenhang mit diesen Tätigkeiten stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Jörg Brand GmbH | Muri bei Bern | 04.02.2015 | 13.12.2023 | |
Dr.Meyer Treuhand AG | Bern | 04.07.2012 | 03.02.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005909592, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG, in Oberwil bei Büren, CHE-349.604.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2020, Publ. 1004986879). Gemäss Erklärung vom 29.11.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand Jörg Brand GmbH (CHE-213.559.387), in Kirchberg BE, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004986879, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG, in Oberwil bei Büren, CHE-349.604.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 04.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 1970971).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imperiali, Aldo, von Oberwil bei Büren, in Oberwil b. Büren (Oberwil bei Büren), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Imperiali, Sandro Rinaldo, von Oberwil bei Büren, in Oberwil b. Büren (Oberwil bei Büren), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Imperiali, Marco Eduard, von Oberwil bei Büren, in Oberwil b. Büren (Oberwil bei Büren), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1970971, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Marco Imperiali Transport + Kieswerk AG, in Oberwil bei Büren, CHE-349.604.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2014, Publ. 1565545).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altra Treuhand AG (CHE-108.133.958), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand Jörg Brand GmbH (CHE-213.559.387), in Kirchberg BE, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.