Reports for Loca-Service Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Loca-Service Sàrl
- Loca-Service Sàrl in Ependes VD is a Limited liability company from the sector «Rental of machinery and movable equipment». Loca-Service Sàrl is active.
- Loca-Service Sàrl was founded on 17.04.1998.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.10.2023.
- Loca-Service Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-104.341.328.
Management (4)
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Bulle,
Michèle Reichenbach,
Marie-Pierre Chapuis,
François-Régis Drouhard
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.04.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Ependes (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.153.862-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.341.328
Sector
Rental of machinery and movable equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Location, montage, sous-traitance et entretien dans le domaine des échafaudages, des machines et du matériel de chantier, y compris travaux s'y rapportant.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Staehli SA | Morrens (VD) | 04.10.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MGS Fiduciaire SA | Morrens (VD) | 13.01.2010 | 03.10.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Loca-service Sàrl
- Loca-service S.à r.l.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Loca-Service Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005853787, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Loca-service S.à r.l., à Assens, CHE-104.341.328 (FOSC du 17.01.2019, p. 0/1004544543). Statuts modifiés le 26.09.2023.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
Loca-Service Sàrl. Siège transféré à Ependes (VD).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin des Serres 8, 1434 Ependes VD.
Nouvelles communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel s'ils sont tous connus, sinon par publication dans la Feuille officielle suisse du commerce. Bulle Nicolas est maintenant à Morges et Reichenbach Michèle maintenant à Orbe.
Publication number: HR02-1004544543, Commercial Registry Office Vaud
Loca-service S.à r.l., à Assens, CHE-104.341.328 (FOSC du 19.12.2018, p. 0/1004525440). Drouhard François-Régis cède 75 de ses 295 parts de CHF 100 au gérant Bulle Nicolas, désormais à Villars-le-Terroir, nouvel associé;
il continue à signer collectivement à deux. Drouhard François-Régis reste titulaire de 220 parts de CHF 100. L'associée Reichenbach Michèle, désormais à Valeyres-sous-Rances, est nommée gérante avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004525440, Commercial Registry Office Vaud
Loca-service S.à r.l., à Assens, CHE-104.341.328 (FOSC du 17.11.2016, p. 0/3168859). Les 10 parts de CHF 100 de Trinquart Sylvie, qui n'est plus associée et dont la signature est radiée, sont cédées par 5 parts à Reichenbach Alexandre, de Lauenen, à Baulmes, et par 5 parts à Reichenbach Michèle, de Lauenen, à Orny, nouvelle associée sans signature, avec 5 parts de CHF 100. Alexandre Reichenbach cède ses 5 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant président Drouhard François-Régis, désormais titulaire de 295 parts de CHF 100.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.