Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Linth Art & Consulting AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.12.1996
Deletion from the commercial register
05.07.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Süd
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.007.981-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.839.455
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unternehmensberatung und Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit dem Handel und Verkauf im Bereich Kunst. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Ebenfalls kann die Gesellschaft im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften und Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treucontrol AG | Egg | 08.06.2010 | 01.11.2015 | |
Treuhandbüro Rolf Fuchs | Freienbach | <2004 | 07.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Linth Solar AG
- Swiss Solar Tec AG
- NKS Marketing AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Linth Art & Consulting AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3624055, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Linth Art & Consulting AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-108.839.455, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 02.11.2015, Publ. 2456997). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die 'Spinnerei Linthal AG', in Linthal (CHE-102.447.370), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 2456997, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Linth Art & Consulting AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-108.839.455, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 13.05.2014, Publ. 1497725). Mit Erklärung vom 19.10.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treucontrol AG (CH-170.3.018.061-6), in Steinhausen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Hans-Peter, von Kirchberg SG, in Ennenda (Glarus), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:von Kirchberg SG und Zollikon, in Zollikon].
Publication number: 1497725, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Linth Art & Consulting AG, in Glarus Süd, CHE-108.839.455, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 01.10.2013, Publ. 1103885).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biesuz, Barbara, von Bidogno TI, in Zürich, Delegierte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.