Reports for Les Mayens H SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Mayens H SA
- Les Mayens H SA has its legal headquarters in Collombey, is active and operates in the sector «Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure».
- Les Mayens H SA was founded on 07.04.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.162.388.
- There are 26 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: A-mark SA, ALIMPEX, S. WAEFFLER, BELLAIR SA.
Management (2)
newest board members
Jean-Nicolas Leglise,
Serge Gérald Georges Alexandre Waeffler
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Nicolas Leglise,
Serge Gérald Georges Alexandre Waeffler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Collombey-Muraz
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.011.540-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.162.388
Sector
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Le développement, la réalisation et l'exploitation du projet hôtelier et de résidences de tourisme dans la région des Mayens d'Hérémence/Valais, de même que tout autre projet touristique analogue. En tant qu'établissement stable, elle peut acquérir et vendre des biens immobiliers et mobiliers permettant de réaliser ce but et développer tous services liés à l'exploitation hôtelière (restauration, bar, spa et soins de bien-être, club enfant,...), de même que la vente de produits du terroir.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Les Mayens d'Hérémence SA en liquidation
- Les Mayens d'Hérémence SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Mayens H SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089694, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Les Mayens H SA, à Collombey-Muraz, CHE-114.162.388, société anonyme (No. FOSC 132 du 10.07.2024, Publ. 1006081100). Par décision du 15.07.2024, le Tribunal Cantonal du Valais a admis l'appel et a annulé la décision rendue le 05.03.2024 par le Tribunal du district de Sion.
Publication number: HR02-1006081121, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Les Mayens d'Hérémence SA, à Sion, CHE-114.162.388, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 01.07.2024, Publ. 1006072050). Par suite de transfert du siège à Collombey-Muraz, l'entité juridique est inscrite au registre du commerce du Bas-Valais. Par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du Registre du commerce du Valais central.
Publication number: HR02-1006081100, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Les Mayens d'Hérémence SA, précédemment à Sion, CHE-114.162.388, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 01.07.2024, Publ. 1006072050).
Modification des statuts:
16.05.2024;
17.06.2024.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Les Mayens H SA.
Nouveau siège:
Collombey-Muraz.
Nouvelle adresse:
Place de la Fontaine 9, 1868 Collombey.
Communicationsaux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Par décision de l'assemblée générale du 16.05.2024, les statuts de la société ont été adaptés à la conversion de par la loi des actions au porteur en actions nominatives au 1er mai 2021 [biffé: Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Léonard, Patrick, ressortissant belge, à Luxembourg (LU), président, avec signature individuelle;
Deschenaux, Yves, ressortissant luxembourgeois, à Luxembourg (LU), administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Leglise, Jean-Nicolas, citoyen français, à Luxembourg (LU), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Waeffler, Sérge Gérald Georges Alexandre, citoyen français, à Collombey-Muraz, administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.