Reports for Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A.
- Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A. in St-Blaise is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments». Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A. is active.
- The management of the company Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A. consists of 5 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 04.06.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A. is the following: CHE-110.608.244.
Management (5)
newest board members
Alpaslan Korkmaz,
Gür Cagdas,
Kurt Kupper,
Nathanaël Marie Schaller,
Jean-Marie Armel Marcel Schaller
newest authorized signatories
Alpaslan Korkmaz,
Gür Cagdas,
Kurt Kupper,
Nathanaël Marie Schaller,
Jean-Marie Armel Marcel Schaller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Blaise
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.096.987-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.608.244
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication et commercialisation de produits liés aux domaines de l'horlogerie, de la bijouterie, de la maroquinerie et d'une manière générale à tous produits de luxe ainsi que la réactivation de l'ancienne marque 'Louis Moinet'; accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, dans l'intérêt de la société.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG SA | Neuchâtel | 10.09.2007 | 12.01.2010 | |
Serratus SA en liquidation | Corcelles-Cormondrèche | 13.04.2004 | 09.09.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
METROPOLIS | 09.05.2008 | active | 50888/2008 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006047786, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A., à Saint-Blaise, CHE-110.608.244 (FOSC du 15.12.2022, p. 0/1005629804). Division des 900 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts, en 9'000 actions de CHF 100, nominatives, liées selon statuts. Les 1'000 actions de CHF 100, nominatives, liées selon statuts, ne sont plus privilégiées quant au droit de vote et au dividende selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 1'000'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 10'000 actions de CHF 100, nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par lettre, email ou toute autre forme permettant la preuve par texte. Statuts modifiés le 28.05.2024. Mérillat Sébastien n'est plus membre du conseil d'administration;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Cagdas Gür, de Turquie, à Istanbul, Turquie, Korkmaz Alpaslan, de Saint-Blaise, à Neuchâtel, Kupper Kurt, de Buttisholz, à Chéserex, et Schaller Nathanaël Marie, de Val Terbi, à Neuchâtel, sont membres du conseil d'administration signature collective à deux avec le président.
Publication number: HR02-1005629804, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A., à Saint-Blaise, CHE-110.608.244 (FOSC du 07.11.2016, p. 0/3147989). Mérillat Sébastien est maintenant domicilié à Evilard.
Publication number: 3147989, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Ateliers Louis Moinet S.A., à Saint-Blaise, CHE-110.608.244 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225830). Statuts modifiés le 20.10.2016 sur des points non soumis à publication.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.