Address
c/o Benjamin Droux
Chemin du Bocage 7
1066 Epalinges
Reports for Lendora SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lendora SA
- Lendora SA is currently active and the industry «Data processing and hosting services». The legal headquarters are in Epalinges.
- The management of the company Lendora SA consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.11.2022.
- In the commercial register the company Lendora SA is registered under the UID CHE-342.591.844.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Epalinges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.164.871-3
UID/VAT
CHE-342.591.844
Sector
Data processing and hosting services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but de fournir des services financiers de toute nature, notamment l'octroi et le courtage de prêts, l'exécution d'opérations de financement, le négoce de créances et la prestation de services de conseil et de courtage en matière d'opérations de crédit, de financement et de commerce de créances; elle a également pour but de faciliter les relations entre prêteurs et emprunteurs, d'exploiter une plateforme de prêts, ainsi que la prestation de tous services dans ce domaine (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | 12.04.2019 | 07.12.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lendora SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005615504, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lendora SA, à Nyon, CHE-342.591.844 (FOSC du 08.12.2021, p. 0/1005352456). Statuts modifiés le 25.10.2022. Siège transféré à Epalinges.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Bocage 7, c/o Benjamin Droux, 1066 Epalinges. Droux Benjamin, de Vuisternens-devant-Romont, à Epalinges, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005352456, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lendora SA, à Nyon, CHE-342.591.844 (FOSC du 19.05.2021, p. 0/1005186519). Selon déclaration du 02.11.2021, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Ernst & Young SA (CHE-294.400.879) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005186519, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lendora SA, à Nyon, CHE-342.591.844 (FOSC du 09.02.2021, p. 0/1005096183). Frey Jean-Jacques, Bégin (nom d'usage Proth) Chrystelle et Le Gallais-Frey Céline ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Bory Jonathan, qui est nommé président, signe désormais individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.