Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Aarberg & Umgebung
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1914
Deletion from the commercial register
06.07.2010
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarberg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.5.001.387-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.942.016
Sector
Production of animal feed
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Föderung des landwirtschaftlichen Betriebes.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 24.07.2008 | 05.07.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Aarberg & Umgebung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5713440, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Aarberg & Umgebung, in Aarberg, CH-073.5.001.387-6, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 24.07.2008, S. 3, Publ. 4588116). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die LANDI Seeland AG, in Ins (CH-217.0.530.250-1), über. Die Genossenschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 4588116, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Aarberg & Umgebung, in Aarberg, CH-073.5.001.387-6, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 10.05.2007, S. 3, Publ. 3924228).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hemund, Ulrich, von Kappelen, in Kappelen, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Scheidegger, Ruedi, von Sumiswald, in Bargen BE, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young AG (CH-035.9.020.344-5), in Bern, Revisionsstelle;
Brunner, Hanspeter, von Lyss, in Kappelen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Leiser-Moser, Peter, von Seedorf BE, in Bargen BE, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3924228, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Aarberg & Umgebung, in Aarberg, CH-073.5.001.387-6, Föderung des landwirtschaftlichen Betriebes, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2005, S. 3, Publ. 3123224).
Domizil neu:
Dr. Carl Moser-Strasse 3, 3270 Aarberg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gross, Fritz, von Walperswil, in Walperswil, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schori, Hans, von Radelfingen, in Radelfingen, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tschanz, Ulrich, von Niederwichtrach, in Seedorf BE, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Blösch-Stettler, Rudolf, von Mörigen, in Mörigen, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burren, Andreas, von Seedorf BE, in Frienisberg (Seedorf BE), Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Helbling, Peter, von Walperswil, in Walperswil, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kocher, Hans, von Mörigen, in Radelfingen, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schneeberger, Stefan, von Täuffelen, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.