Address
c/o Michael Steiner
Rohren 2303
9100 Herisau
Reports for Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau
- Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau is currently active and the industry «Trading in agricultural products and livestock». The legal headquarters are in Herisau.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 04.03.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau is the following: CHE-108.782.097.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.09.1908
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Herisau
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.5.012.158-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.782.097
Sector
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterstützung der Landwirtschaft in allen ihren Zweigen sowie Ermöglichung der Sömmerung des Jungviehs der Mitglieder in den Genossenschaftsalpen. Zur Weiterbildung der Mitglieder können Kurse, Vorträge und Ausstellungen durchgeführt werden, wenn nötig mit finanzielle Unterstützung.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004844586, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau, in Herisau, CHE-108.782.097, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2018, Publ. 4008645).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Seeholzer, Wendelin, von Küssnacht SZ, in Herisau, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knellwolf, Ueli, von Herisau, in Herisau, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Inauen, Jakob, von Appenzell, in Herisau, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident].
Publication number: 4008645, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau, in Herisau, CHE-108.782.097, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 11.06.2009, Publ. 5062146).
Domizil neu:
c/o Michael Steiner, Rohren 2303, 9100 Herisau.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knellwolf, Thomas, von Herisau, in Herisau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Signer, Christian, von Hundwil, in Herisau, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Michael, von Kaltbrunn, in Herisau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Inauen, Jakob, von Appenzell, in Herisau, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5062146, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Land- und Alpwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Herisau, in Herisau, CH-300.5.012.158-1, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2009, S. 3, Publ. 5030290).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Menzi, Hans, von Filzbach, in Herisau, Kassier und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frick, Jakob, von Urnäsch, in Herisau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Seeholzer, Wendelin, Küssnacht SZ, in Herisau, Mitglied und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüegg, Pius, von St. Gallenkappel, in St. Gallen, Mitglied und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knellwolf, Thomas, von Herisau, in Herisau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien (bisher: Mitglied und Aktuar).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.