Reports for Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A.
- Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A. is active in the industry «Manufacturing of medical goods» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Fribourg.
- The company was founded on 10.01.1983.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 19.12.2014.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.562.229.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.134.340-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.562.229
Sector
Manufacturing of medical goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fabrication de prothèses dentaires.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAF Sàrl | Fribourg | 20.07.2007 | 09.11.2009 | |
Fidexpert SA Fribourg, Granges-Paccot | Granges-Paccot | <2004 | 19.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Laboratoire dentaires R. Kessler SA
- Laboratoire dentaire Kessler R. SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1892483, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A., à Fribourg, CHE-101.562.229 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Rossier Nicolas, administrateur, est nommé président, et Catillaz-Christinaz Angélique, de Cugy FR, à Estavayer-le-Lac, est nomée administratrice et secrétaire, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 1020227, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A., à Fribourg, CH-217-0134340-1 (FOSC du 31.07.2013, p. 0/1008721). Complément à l'inscription No 3632 du 26.07.2013 (FOSC du 31.07.2013, Id 1008721): Kessler Rolf n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: 1008721, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Laboratoire dentaire R. Kessler S.A., à Fribourg, CH-217-0134340-1 (FOSC du 10.11.2009, p. 9/5335526). Nicolet François n'est plus administrateur, sa signature est radiée. Rossier Nicolas, de La Brillaz, à Estavayer-le-Lac, est nommé administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.