Reports for La Provençale SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout La Provençale SA
- La Provençale SA from St-Sulpice VD operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The company was founded on 01.08.1955 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 05.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-102.382.380.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: CATERING MANIF Sàrl, SI Zumap SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.08.1955
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Sulpice (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.122.060-6
UID/VAT
CHE-102.382.380
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, construction, transformation, exploitation et gérance de tous immeubles.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- La Provençale
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: La Provençale SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006100181, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Provençale SA, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), CHE-102.382.380 (FOSC du 26.05.2021, p. 0/1005192994). Salzmann Daniel et Salzmann Frédéric ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. La signature de Salzmann Gérard est radiée. Castro Yvan, de Zürich, à Nyon, est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005192994, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Provençale SA, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), CHE-102.382.380 (FOSC du 12.09.2017, p. 0/3747743). Le 1er mai 2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions:
CHF 50'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 50'000, divisé en 50 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: 3747743, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Provençale SA, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), CHE-102.382.380 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Gillioz André n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature collective à deux:
Castro Elisabeth, de Zurich, à Nyon, Salzmann Daniel, à Saint-Prex, président, et Salzmann Frédéric, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), tous deux de Signau.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.