Reports for Külling AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Külling AG
- Külling AG with its legal headquarters in Wilchingen is active. Külling AG operates in the sector «Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 11.02.1937.
- On the 22.07.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Külling AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.694.440.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Stephan Roland Regli,
Roland Külling,
Felix Külling,
Michèle Külling
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.02.1937
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wilchingen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.002.954-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.694.440
Sector
Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung und Vertrieb von Betonwaren und Betonelementen, sowie Ausführung von Kunststeinarbeiten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mannhart + Fehr Treuhand AG | Schaffhausen | 18.09.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Leu Treuhand AG | Neuhausen am Rheinfall | <2004 | 17.09.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Külling AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005527150, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Külling AG, in Wilchingen, CHE-101.694.440, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2022, Publ. 1005452898).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Regli, Stephan Roland, von Hallau, in Hallau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005452898, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Külling AG, in Wilchingen, CHE-101.694.440, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2011, S.0, Publ. 6351104).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Külling, Hans, von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6351104, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Külling AG, in Wilchingen, CH-290.3.002.954-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 17.08.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6298558).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Külling, Max, von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Külling, Heinrich jun., von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Külling, Rudolf, von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Külling, Felix, von Wilchingen, in Neunkirch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Külling, Michèle, von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Külling, Roland, von Wilchingen, in Wilchingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Unterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.