Reports for Kosag Kompostier AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kosag Kompostier AG
- Kosag Kompostier AG is active in the industry «Waste collection, treatment and disposal» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Villnachern.
- The company was founded on 08.03.1989 and has 5 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.06.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-101.522.862.
Management (5)
newest board members
Daniel Knecht,
Sandro Jan Graf,
Dr. Richard Michael Zickermann,
Dominik Stahel
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Knecht,
Sandro Jan Graf,
Dr. Richard Michael Zickermann,
Dominik Stahel,
David Tentsü Büchli
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.03.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Villnachern
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.008.190-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.522.862
Sector
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereiche der Entsorgung von Abfällen, insbesondere Grünabfällen und deren Verwertung; ein allfälliger "kann Zweck" ist aus den Statuten zu entnehmen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AWB Revisionen AG | Aarau | 04.10.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zimmerli Treuhand AG | Lenzburg | 05.11.2019 | 03.10.2023 | |
BDO AG | Aarau | <2004 | 19.08.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kosag Kompostier AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006058789, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Kosag Kompostier AG, in Villnachern, CHE-101.522.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2023, Publ. 1005852319).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roth, Renato, von Zofingen, in Birr, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graf, Sandro Jan, von Rebstein, in Zofingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knecht, Daniel, von Windisch, in Windisch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005852319, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Kosag Kompostier AG, in Villnachern, CHE-101.522.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2023, Publ. 1005679104).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loosli, Simon, von Wyssachen, in Holderbank (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zimmerli Treuhand AG (CHE-107.893.860), in Lenzburg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zickermann, Richard, von Villnachern, in Villnachern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Roth, Renato, von Zofingen, in Birr, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stahel, Dominik, von Villnachern, in Würenlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
AWB Revisionen AG (CHE-110.051.732), in Aarau, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005679104, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Kosag Kompostier AG, in Villnachern, CHE-101.522.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2022, Publ. 1005640589).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stahel, Dominik, von Villnachern, in Würenlingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Büchli, David, von Böztal, in Steinhausen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.