Reports for Kindler Modellbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kindler Modellbau AG
- Kindler Modellbau AG is active in the industry «Trading with recreational products» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Deitingen.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 30.09.2014.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-109.394.349.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.02.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Deitingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.015.645-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.394.349
Sector
Trading with recreational products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Modellbauartikeln mit sämtlichem Zubehör sowie technischen Spielwaren. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Andreas Bitter Consulting | Ittigen | <2004 | 14.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kindler Modellbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1741679, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Kindler Modellbau AG, in Deitingen, CHE-109.394.349, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 15.12.2008, S. 18, Publ. 4779872).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kindler, Stefan, von Lyssach, in Subingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bolken];
Kindler-Steinacher, Corinne, von Lyssach und Gansingen, in Subingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bolken].
Publication number: 4779872, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Kindler Modellbau AG, in Deitingen, CH-053.3.015.645-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 16.12.2004, S. 14, Publ. 2593452).
Statutenänderung:
3.12.2008. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 03.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft der ordentlichen Revision nicht und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kindler, Peter, von Lyssach, in Niederbipp, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Andreas Bitter Consulting, in Ittigen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kindler, Stefan, von Lyssach, in Bolken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Publication number: 2605582, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kindler Modellbau AG, in Niederbipp, CH-053.3.015.645-9, Handel mit Modellbauartikeln mit sämtlichem Zubehör sowie technischen Spielwaren, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2002, S. 3, Publ. 361740). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Deitingen (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 16.12.2004, S. 14) im Handelsregister Emmental-Oberaargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.