Reports for Jost Druck AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jost Druck AG
- Jost Druck AG is active in the industry «Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hünibach.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.02.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.101.519.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hilterfingen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.009.042-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.101.519
Sector
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer graphischen Unternehmung. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NAVICA Revisions AG | Thun | 08.12.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Heinz Gäumann Treuhand AG | Thun | <2004 | 07.12.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jost Druck AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005959523, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jost Druck AG, in Hilterfingen, CHE-105.101.519, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 26.05.2023, Publ. 1005754534).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hari, Philippe, von Kandergrund, in Kandersteg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Atanasovski, Toshe, von Thun, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hodler, Beat, von Gurzelen, in Oberhofen am Thunersee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005754534, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jost Druck AG, in Hilterfingen, CHE-105.101.519, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 19.04.2021, Publ. 1005152304).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schaub, Bruno, von Rünenberg, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hodler, Beat, von Gurzelen, in Oberhofen am Thunersee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005152304, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jost Druck AG, in Hilterfingen, CHE-105.101.519, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004904651).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gasser, Cornelia, von Belp, in Belp, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaub, Bruno, von Rünenberg, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.