Reports for Josef Christen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Josef Christen AG
- Josef Christen AG from Rain operates in the sector «Other construction» and is active.
- The company was founded on 20.12.1976 and has 6 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 31.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.800.072.
Management (6)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Carlos Manuel Da Eira Oliveira,
Stefanie Bachmann,
Marcel Christen,
Pius Otto Gasser,
Esther Straub-Fuchs
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.12.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rain
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.005.144-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.800.072
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Eisen- und Betonarmierungen sowie alle mit dem Baugewerbe zusammenhängenden Spezialarbeiten; Beteiligungen; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Immobilien.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fuhrer und Partner Audit AG | Stans | 27.10.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trevus AG | Sursee | <2004 | 26.10.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Christen Josef AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Josef Christen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006044848, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Josef Christen AG, in Rain, CHE-105.800.072, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 09.02.2023, Publ. 1005673956).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann, Stefanie, von Neuenkirch und Hildisrieden, in Beromünster, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Da Eira Oliveira, Carlos Manuel, portugiesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005673956, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Josef Christen AG, in Rain, CHE-105.800.072, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644331).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Pius, von Lungern, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Christen, Marcel, von Wolfenschiessen, in Rain, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005644331, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Josef Christen AG, in Rain, CHE-105.800.072, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 11.11.2020, Publ. 1005020055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Künzi, Peter, von Mirchel, in Kriens, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.